OH SB318 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-19)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Effective 12/17/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-19)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Effective 12/17/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend Section 1 of S.B. 30 of the 133rd General Assembly to extend the Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission until December 31, 2021, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Extends Women's Suffrage Centennial Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Effective 12/17/20 | |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2020-11-24 | Senate | Amendments laid over under the rule |
2020-11-18 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-09-24 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-22 | House | Informally passed |
2020-09-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Rules and Reference |
2020-08-31 | House | Refer to Committee: Rules and Reference |
2020-06-25 | House | Introduced |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 05 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |