OH SB37 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-30 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 107.036, 122.85, 5726.98, 5733.98, 5747.98, and 5751.98 of the Revised Code to extend eligibility for and make other changes to the motion picture tax credit.
Title
Extend eligibility for and revise the motion picture tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-05-13 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 07 | 036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 22 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 26 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 33 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 51 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |