OH SB39 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21 - Emergency effective 12/29/20; most provisions effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21 - Emergency effective 12/29/20; most provisions effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 107.036, 1311.87, 1311.88, 1311.90, 5725.98, 5729.98, and 5747.98 and to enact sections 122.09, 5725.35, 5729.18, and 5747.29 of the Revised Code to authorize an insurance premiums tax credit for capital contributions to transformational mixed use development projects, to authorize an income tax credit for campaign contributions, to modify the law governing commercial real estate broker liens, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize insurance premiums tax credit for certain projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-19 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Effective 3/31/21 - Emergency effective 12/29/20; most provisions effective 3/31/21 | |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2020-12-08 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-11-19 | House | Reported - Substitute: Economic and Workforce Development |
2019-06-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 07 | 036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 11 | 87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 11 | 88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | 11 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 25 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 25 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 29 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 29 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 47 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |