OH SB57 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-28)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Effective 7/30/19 - Emergency: Most provisions effective 07/30/19; Certain provisions effective 09/20/19 and 03/22/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-28)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Effective 7/30/19 - Emergency: Most provisions effective 07/30/19; Certain provisions effective 09/20/19 and 03/22/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.572, 924.01, 3719.01, 3719.41, 4729.01, 4776.01, and 5713.30, to enact sections 924.212, 928.01, 928.02, 928.03, 928.04, 928.05, 928.06, 928.07, and 928.99 of the Revised Code to establish conditions and requirements governing the regulation of hemp and hemp products, to amend the version of section 109.572 that is scheduled to take effect on September 20, 2019, and the versions of sections 3719.01, 3719.41, and 4729.01 of the Revised Code that are scheduled to take effect on March 22, 2020, to continue the provisions of this act on and after those dates, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Decriminalize hemp and license hemp cultivation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Effective 7/30/19 - Emergency: Most provisions effective 07/30/19; Certain provisions effective 09/20/19 and 03/22/20 | |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2019-07-17 | House | Passed - Amended |
2019-06-05 | House | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 09 | 572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 19 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 76 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 76 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 13 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
9 | 24 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 24 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 28 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 28 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |