OH SB58 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2945.37, 2945.371, 2945.38, and 2945.39 of the Revised Code to make changes to the requirements for competency evaluations and mental health treatment in criminal cases and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards restoring competency for mentally ill charged with crime

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-10-25HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23SenatePassed
2019-10-09SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2019-02-26SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-21SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2945Amended CodeCitation Text
294537Amended CodeCitation Text
2945371Amended CodeCitation Text
294538Amended CodeCitation Text
294539Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback