OH SB8 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Refer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
Pending: House Economic and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 107.036, 122.86, 5747.02, and 5747.98 and to enact section 122.84 of the Revised Code to authorize a tax credit for investments in an Ohio Opportunity Zone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize tax credit for investment in opportunity zone

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced
2019-04-03SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2019-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
107Amended CodeCitation Text
107036Amended CodeCitation Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
12284New CodeSee Bill Text
122841New CodeSee Bill Text
12286Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5725Amended CodeCitation Text
572598Amended CodeCitation Text
5726Amended CodeCitation Text
572698Amended CodeCitation Text
5729Amended CodeCitation Text
572998Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574702Amended CodeCitation Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback