OH SB89 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 46-13)
Status: Enrolled on February 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Conference report agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3310.02, 3310.03, 3310.031, 3310.032, 3310.035, 3313.14, 3313.482, 3313.82, 3313.903, 3314.03, 3314.19, 3319.226, 3319.301, 3326.032, 3326.17, 3333.16, 3345.81, 5709.62, 5709.63, 5709.632, 5709.82, and 5709.83; to enact sections 3301.0730, 3317.037, 3319.2211, 3345.351, 3345.481, and 6301.23; and to repeal section 3311.242 of the Revised Codewith regard to career-technical education and the compensation of joint vocational school districts located in enterprise zones, with regard to student degree completion at state institutions of higher education, to make changes regarding STEM school report cards, to revise the eligibility of the Educational Choice Scholarship program, to repeal, on September 1, 2021, a law regarding transfers of school district territory located within a township split between two or more school districts, and to permit career centers to receive a STEM or STEAM school equivalent designation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards career-technical ed and JVSD in enterprise zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseConference report agreed to
2020-11-18SenateConference report agreed to: Conference Committee on S.B. 89
2020-09-21HouseConference managers: Reps. - Jones, Scherer, Robinson: Conference Committee on S.B. 89
2020-08-27SenateConference managers: Sens. - Peterson, Huffman, M., Fedor
2020-02-12HouseInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2020-02-12SenateRefused to concur in House amendments
2020-02-05HousePassed - Amended
2020-02-05HouseInformally passed
2020-02-05HouseReported - Substitute: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-10-29HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2019-10-25HouseIntroduced
2019-10-23SenatePassed
2019-10-16SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2019-03-12SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
33010730New CodeSee Bill Text
331002Amended CodeCitation Text
331003Amended CodeCitation Text
3310031Amended CodeCitation Text
3310032Amended CodeCitation Text
3310035Repealed CodeCitation Text
3311242Repealed CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
331314Amended CodeCitation Text
3313482Amended CodeCitation Text
331382Amended CodeCitation Text
3313903Amended CodeCitation Text
3314Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
331419Amended CodeCitation Text
3317Amended CodeCitation Text
3317037New CodeSee Bill Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
33192211New CodeSee Bill Text
3319226Amended CodeCitation Text
3319301Amended CodeCitation Text
3326Amended CodeCitation Text
3326032Amended CodeCitation Text
332617Amended CodeCitation Text
333316Amended CodeCitation Text
3345351New CodeSee Bill Text
3345481New CodeSee Bill Text
334581Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570962Amended CodeCitation Text
570963Amended CodeCitation Text
5709632Amended CodeCitation Text
570982Amended CodeCitation Text
570983Amended CodeCitation Text
630123New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-SB-89
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/CR/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/sb89/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-SB-89

Bill Comments

feedback