OH SCR16 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
Pending: House Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To call for justice for victims of excessive force by police and declare opposition to efforts to defund law enforcement.
Title
Remedy police use of excess force/oppose defunding police
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2020-09-30 | House | Offered |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Offered |