OH SCR8 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to enact The Sunshine Protection Act of 2019, which would permanently extend daylight saving time.
Title
Urge Congress-permanently extend Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Adopted |
2020-12-02 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2020-05-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-05-05 | House | Offered |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported: General Government and Agency Review |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Offered |