OK HB1002 | 2013 | Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; modifying exclusions; emergency.
Title
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; modifying exclusions; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-04 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2013-09-03 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sykes |
2013-09-03 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2013-09-03 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-09-03 | House | First Reading |