OK HB1010 | 2013 | Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Approved by Governor 09/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; providing restrictions on attorneys involved in due process hearings; emergency.
Title
Schools; providing restrictions on attorneys involved in due process hearings; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | House | Approved by Governor 09/10/2013 |
2013-09-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-09-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-09-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-09-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-09-09 | Senate | coauthored by Wright |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-09-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-09-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-09-05 | House | Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-09-05 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-09-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-09-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley, Shortey |
2013-09-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stiles, Ritze, Cockroft, Nollan |
2013-09-05 | House | General Order |
2013-09-04 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2013-09-03 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sykes |
2013-09-03 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2013-09-03 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-09-03 | House | First Reading |