OK HB1021 | 2013 | Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-04 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; providing restrictions on attorneys involved in due process hearings; emergency.
Title
Schools; providing restrictions on attorneys involved in due process hearings; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-09-03 | House | Authored by Representative Perryman |
2013-09-03 | House | First Reading |