OK HB1027 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State government; authorizing Governor to appoint certain chief executives; providing for determination of compensation; making certain boards advisory; effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing Governor to appoint certain chief executives; providing for determination of compensation; making certain boards advisory; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 2 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |