OK HB1060 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1060
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Life and Health Guaranty Association Act; broadening applicability; effective date.
Title
Insurance; Life and Health Guaranty Association Act; broadening applicability; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019