OK HB1065 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; categories of employment contracts; changing time when employee information worksheets are to be provided to teachers and administrators.
Title
Schools; categories of employment contracts; changing time when employee information worksheets are to be provided to teachers and administrators.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] |
Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | House | House Rule suspended |
2016-05-18 | House | Considered |
2016-05-17 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-17 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Strohm |
2015-05-20 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Stanislawski, Ford, Schulz, Garrison, Smalley, David, Floyd |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2015-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Emergency not considered |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, McCullough |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |