OK HB1182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion; effective date.
Title
Physician licensure; directing Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision and State Board of Osteopathic Examiners to revoke licenses for performing abortion; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author)