OK HB1281 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Mines; relating to the inspection and examination of strip and surface mines; modifying duty to inspect; relating to operators fees; modifying certain fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Department of Mines; relating to the inspection and examination of strip and surface mines; modifying duty to inspect; relating to operators fees; modifying certain fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-11 | 2 CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-11 | To Senate | |
2010-05-11 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-11 | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-03 | 2 CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2010-02-16 | Further conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-08 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-21 | Title restored | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2009-04-22 | SA's received | |
2009-04-22 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-21 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-21 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-03-23 | Direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-09 | First Reading | |
2009-02-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-05 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 | |
2009-02-05 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-05 | Amended | |
2009-02-05 | General Order | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2009-02-02 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |