OK HB1287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1287
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; investigations; requiring Department of Human Services to complete investigation within fort-five days.
Title
Child care; investigations; requiring Department of Human Services to complete investigation within fort-five days.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1287 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author)