OK HB1340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1340
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; definition of nonfiscal retirement bill; one-time benefits; one-time increase to retirement systems; effective dates.
Title
Public retirement systems; definition of nonfiscal retirement bill; one-time benefits; one-time increase to retirement systems; effective dates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 28 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 58 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 28 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Considered |
2018-05-01 | House | Laid over on 4th Reading |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Brooks, Ikley-Freeman, Stanislawski, Floyd, Dossett |
2018-05-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2018-05-01 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 3 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2018-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (Leslie) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 |
2018-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson |
2018-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush, McEntire, Wallace, West (Tammy), Ford (Roger), Sanders, McEachin, McCall |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1340 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 49 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 930 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |