OK HB1416 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1416
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Diversionary court programs; creating the Oklahoma Diversionary Court Funding Program Act; effective date.
Title
Diversionary court programs; creating the Oklahoma Diversionary Court Funding Program Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Waldron [D] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7 |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Waldron |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1416 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee