OK HB1472 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Roads, bridges and ferries; relating to county bridge improvement; increasing certain account reimbursement limits; modifying entities allowed to award approved projects. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Roads, bridges and ferries; relating to county bridge improvement; increasing certain account reimbursement limits; modifying entities allowed to award approved projects. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-27 Died in conference
2009-05-04 Conference granted, GCCA
2009-04-30 HC's named: Sanders, Armes, Blackwell, DeWitt, McPeak, Rousselot, Sears, Wright (Harold), Liebmann, Proctor, Collins
2009-04-27 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2009-04-13 SA's received
2009-04-13 Engrossed to House
2009-04-08 Referred for engrossment
2009-04-08 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
2009-04-08 General Order, Considered
2009-03-30 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2009-03-25 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR
2009-03-17 Second Reading referred to Appropriations
2009-03-05 First Reading
2009-03-05 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2009-03-04 Referred for engrossment
2009-03-04 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0
2009-03-04 Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker
2009-03-04 General Order
2009-02-26 Coauthored by Senator(s) Marlatt
2009-02-26 Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author)
2009-02-26 Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey, Hickman
2009-02-26 CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2009-02-03 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2009-02-02 Authored by Representative Sanders
2009-02-02 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
69662New CodeSee Bill Text
69689New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback