OK HB1750 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1750
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; enacting the Oklahoma Local Hospital and Health Care District Act of 2019; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; enacting the Oklahoma Local Hospital and Health Care District Act of 2019; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1750 (Carry Over) 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations