OK HB1781 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1781
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student teachers; elimination of nonsalaried teacher internship requirement; emergency.
Title
Student teachers; elimination of nonsalaried teacher internship requirement; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hill |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Emergency added |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1781 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019