OK HB1902 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1902
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Haste
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Haste
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing homes; establish pay-for-performance; modify reimbursement methodology; quality improvements.
Title
Nursing homes; establish pay-for-performance; modify reimbursement methodology; quality improvements.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. Emily Virgin [D] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] |
Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Ronny Johns [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Merleyn Bell [D] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] |
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] |
Sen. Bill Coleman [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bice |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin, Wallace, Johns, Hilbert, Lawson, Frix, Luttrell, Townley, Munson, Conley, Fetgatter, Bell, Ford, Russ, Humphrey, Tadlock |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1902 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator Haste