OK HB1915 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; prohibiting certain funds in the Canceled Warrant Fund from being transferred into the General Revenue Fund.
Title
Public finance; prohibiting certain funds in the Canceled Warrant Fund from being transferred into the General Revenue Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: F DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: F DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: F DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: F DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Boles, McEntire |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1915 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee