OK HB1969 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Jurors; modifying persons disqualified from jury duty; effective date.
Title
Jurors; modifying persons disqualified from jury duty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 19 |
2019-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1969 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary