OK HB1970 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1970
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Victims impact panel programs; authorizing court to permit online participation in victims impact panel program; effective date.
Title
Victims impact panel programs; authorizing court to permit online participation in victims impact panel program; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1970 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee