OK HB2041 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of radiologic technology; creating the Radiologic Technologist Licensure Act; creating Radiologic Technologist Advisory Committee; effective date.
Title
Practice of radiologic technology; creating the Radiologic Technologist Licensure Act; creating Radiologic Technologist Advisory Committee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Davis |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Moore