OK HB2207 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; exempting use or application of carbon monoxide from certain license; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; exempting use or application of carbon monoxide from certain license; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2207 (Carry Over) 2019-02-19 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee