OK HB2251 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; allowing certain persons to use state purchasing cards; requiring Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department to conduct audits; effective date.
Title
State government; allowing certain persons to use state purchasing cards; requiring Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department to conduct audits; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Rep. Nicole Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Mize |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2251 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Title stricken