OK HB2288 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; authorizing additional state employee health insurance opt-out option; effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing additional state employee health insurance opt-out option; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-23 | CCR read | |
2012-05-23 | To Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | Title restored | |
2012-05-21 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Brown, Ford, Ballenger, Justice, Stanislawski | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-23 | SA's received | |
2012-04-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Virgin | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6060 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1308 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |