OK HB2295 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Agriculture; relating to the Oklahoma Farmed Cervidae Act; adding definitions; providing licensing procedures; providing facility procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Agriculture; relating to the Oklahoma Farmed Cervidae Act; adding definitions; providing licensing procedures; providing facility procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Fred Jordan [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 7 | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Laid over | |
2010-05-25 | Considered | |
2010-05-24 | Emergency added | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-17 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan | |
2010-05-13 | Remove Representative Jordan as principal House author and substitute with Representative Armes | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-06 | HC's added: Jackson, Trebilcock, Buck, Kouplen, Scott | |
2010-05-06 | HC's removed: Jordan, Hickman, Pruett, Smithson | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Jordan, Hickman, Armes, DeWitt, Pruett, Smithson | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Schulz, Justice, Marlatt, Burrage, Garrison | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Remove as author Senator Burrage; authored by Senator Schulz | |
2010-04-20 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-04-14 | Pending removal author Senator Burrage and replace with Senator Schulz | |
2010-03-24 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ivester | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Jordan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 10 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 6 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |