OK HB2314 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; extending duration of certain nonresident fishing license. Effective date.
Title
Game and fish; extending duration of certain nonresident fishing license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named: Smithson, Richardson, Pruett, Sears, Hickman, Jett, Sullivan, Brannon, Shoemake, Rousselot, Thomsen | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Ballenger, Schulz, Justice, Marlatt, Ellis | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-06 | SA's received | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-22 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Smithson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |