OK HB2339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; prohibiting certain vaccinations without prior authorization; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; prohibiting certain vaccinations without prior authorization; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-04-08SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-04-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Randleman
2019-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2019-03-28SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-25SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 27
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2339&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2339%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2339%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2339%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2339%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2339%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2339%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2339_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2339_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback