OK HB2363 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2363
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; licenses; authority expansion; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; licenses; authority expansion; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Kannady [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Leewright, Bice, McCortney, Brooks, Young |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 8 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2363 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference