OK HB2368 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2368
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Opioids; creating the Oklahoma Commission on Opioid Abuse; effective date; emergency.
Title
Opioids; creating the Oklahoma Commission on Opioid Abuse; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2019-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Emergency added |
2019-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2368 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019