OK HB2612 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2612
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Approved by Governor 03/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Approved by Governor 03/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; creating the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act.
Title
Medical marijuana; creating the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana and Patient Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 03/14/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-03-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 5 |
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | General Order |
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2612 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Approved by Governor 03/14/2019