OK HB2614 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2614
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marijuana; medical marijuana licensing requirements and restrictions; modifying penalty for certain unlawful act; emergency.
Title
Marijuana; medical marijuana licensing requirements and restrictions; modifying penalty for certain unlawful act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named McCortney, Smalley, Daniels, Pugh, Ikley-Freeman, Young |
2019-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-12 | House | Emergency added |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2614 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference