OK HB2641 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education; statewide student assessment system; changing date by which preliminary assessment results are to be reported to school districts; final electronic data file results; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; statewide student assessment system; changing date by which preliminary assessment results are to be reported to school districts; final electronic data file results; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2019-05-21HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Caldwell (Chad), Hasenbeck, Waldron, Vancuren
2019-05-21HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-26SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Baker
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2641&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB2641%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB2641%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB2641%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB2641%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2641%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB2641%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2641_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2641_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback