OK HB2658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; extending date for privatization of CompSource.
Title
Workers' compensation; extending date for privatization of CompSource.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-18 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-27 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-26 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 26 Nays: 21 | |
2010-05-26 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-18 | CCR read | |
2010-05-18 | To Senate | |
2010-05-18 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 43; Ayes: 55 Nays: 38 | |
2010-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-12 | Emergency added | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), Liebmann, Peters, Moore, Morgan, Carey | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, SCs named Aldridge, Anderson, Brown, Coffee, Laster | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-06 | SA's received | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-05 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 | |
2010-04-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 17 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-17 | Remove as author Senator Coffee; authored by Senator Aldridge | |
2010-03-17 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Pending removal author Senator Coffee and replace with Senator Aldridge | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 24 | |
2010-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-01 | Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-17 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
85 | 131c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 2b | New Code | See Bill Text |