OK HB2673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2673
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State employee compensation; salary increase; effective date; emergency.
Title
State employee compensation; salary increase; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2673 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations