OK HB2710 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax checkoff for the Multiple Sclerosis Society. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax checkoff for the Multiple Sclerosis Society. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-21 - House - House: (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-21 | To Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lamons, Hoskin, Kiesel, Walker, Shelton | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Collins, Steele, Jett, Joyner, Brown, Nations, Sears | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-15 | SA's received | |
2010-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Collins | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2368 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |