OK HB2779 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; modifying duties to include establishment of an emergency alert notification system; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; modifying duties to include establishment of an emergency alert notification system; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Lockhart |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |