OK HB2821 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Financing disability expenses; creating Fred's Law; creating the Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Savings Plan Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financing disability expenses; creating Fred's Law; creating the Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Savings Plan Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-24HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-23SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2016-05-23SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2016-05-18Senatecoauthored by Shelton
2016-05-18Senatecoauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie)
2016-05-18SenateCCR read, GCCA
2016-05-18HouseTo Senate
2016-05-18HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13
2016-05-18HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2016-05-02SenateConference granted, GCCA
2016-04-28HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2016-04-20HouseSA's received
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2016-04-19SenateTitle restored
2016-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2016-04-07Senatecoauthored by Echols
2016-04-07SenateCoauthored by Halligan
2016-04-07SenateRemove as author Senator Halligan; authored by Crain
2016-04-06SenateTitle stricken
2016-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2016-04-06Senatecoauthored by Stanislawski
2016-04-06Senatecoauthored by Mazzei
2016-04-05SenateReferred to Appropriations
2016-04-05SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2016-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2016-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2016-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy), Bennett, Sherrer, Dunnington, Brumbaugh
2016-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author)
2016-02-25HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Nelson
2016-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-16HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2016-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Denney
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5623052New CodeSee Bill Text
5640011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5640017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6313013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2821&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2821%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2821%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2821%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2821%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2821%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2821%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2821%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2821%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2821_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2821_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback