OK HB2891 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Holidays; Veterans Suicide Awareness Week; emergency.
Title
Holidays; Veterans Suicide Awareness Week; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Emergency added |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Dossett, Rosino |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walke, Talley, Sims, Steagall, Dollens, Phillips, Caldwell (Trey), Albright, Munson, Fincher |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Miller, West (Josh), Roberts (Dustin), Roe, Davis, West (Tammy), Kiger, Wright, Olsen, Hill, Cornwell, Townley, Conley, Hilbert, Lawson, McEntire, Fetgatter, Boles, McDugle, Luttrell, Fugate, Boatman, Marti, Stark, Kerbs, Provenzano, Randleman, Mize, Hasenbeck, Worthen, Manger, Grego, Pae, Sterling, Hardin (David), Burns |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Rosecrants |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |