OK HB2905 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Virtual Charter School Reform and Transparency Act of 2020; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; creating the Virtual Charter School Reform and Transparency Act of 2020; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] | Rep. Robert Manger [R] |
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/18/2020 |
2020-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Manger |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Randleman |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fincher, Pae |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |