OK HB3229 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; amending SQ 788, Initiative Petition 412; patient and caregiver licensing requirements; residency requirement; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; amending SQ 788, Initiative Petition 412; patient and caregiver licensing requirements; residency requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12 |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |