OK HB3280 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Coauthored by Senator Pittman
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying leave benefits; effective date.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; modifying leave benefits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-13 | House | Amended |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |