OK HB3297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; Federally Qualified Health Centers; board of directors; Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Federally Qualified Health Centers; board of directors; Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |