OK HB3373 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Shelby Johnson and Logan Deardorf Act of 2020; authority to deny application for or cancel license for certain ailments; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Shelby Johnson and Logan Deardorf Act of 2020; authority to deny application for or cancel license for certain ailments; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 11 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sterling |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 64 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Sharp (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sterling |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |